08/03/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/21/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |||
06/13/2023 | Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate | |||
06/13/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT | |||
06/13/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 157 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/13/2023 | Lifted From Table in House | |||
06/13/2023 | Laid On Table in House | |||
05/16/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 5 Favorable | |||
05/12/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |