05/16/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
03/21/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 7 NO | |||
03/13/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 5 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |||
01/23/2024 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |||
01/23/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 2 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |||
01/23/2024 | Amendment HA 3 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
01/23/2024 | Amendment HA 2 to HS 1 - Stricken in House | |||
01/23/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Stricken in House | |||
06/28/2023 | Amendment HA 3 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/27/2023 | Amendment HA 2 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/23/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/22/2023 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of HB 162 |