LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB163
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB163
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB163
Action History
08/09/2023
Signed by Governor
06/30/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
06/27/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
06/22/2023
Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
06/22/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
06/07/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 11 On Its Merits
05/17/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House