06/30/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/29/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO | |||
06/29/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |||
06/28/2023 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
06/28/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |||
06/28/2023 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |||
06/27/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 26 YES 12 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |||
06/27/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 177 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/27/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 177 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/21/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |||
06/14/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
06/14/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |||
05/18/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |