LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB181
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB181
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB181
Action History
09/11/2023
Signed by Governor
06/29/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
06/21/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
06/20/2023
Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
06/20/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
06/07/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 11 On Its Merits
06/01/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House