07/31/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/28/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 5 Favorable | |||
06/20/2023 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |||
06/20/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/20/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 183 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/15/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 183 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/07/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 7 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |||
06/01/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |