LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB19
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB19
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB19
Action History
07/17/2024
Signed by Governor
06/18/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
05/21/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
03/26/2024
Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate
03/26/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 1 NO 6 ABSENT
03/19/2024
was introduced and adopted in lieu of HB 19