08/07/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/25/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/25/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |||
05/22/2024 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
05/22/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |||
05/09/2024 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |||
05/09/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |||
05/09/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 200 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
05/07/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |||
06/01/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 200 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/04/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
05/03/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 7 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |||
04/25/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |