LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB205
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB205
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB205
Action History
08/07/2023
Signed by Governor
06/30/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
06/28/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
06/22/2023
Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
06/22/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT
06/21/2023
was introduced and adopted in lieu of HB 205