09/21/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/27/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 4 NO 1 ABSENT | |||
06/22/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |||
06/20/2023 | Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate | |||
06/20/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 14 NO 2 ABSENT | |||
06/13/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |||
06/08/2023 | Re-Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House | |||
06/08/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in House |