LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB218
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB218
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB218
Action History
08/09/2023
Signed by Governor
06/30/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
06/28/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
06/20/2023
Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
06/20/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
06/14/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
06/08/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House