LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB219
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB219
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB219
Action History
08/03/2023
Signed by Governor
06/29/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
06/27/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
06/15/2023
Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate
06/15/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
06/14/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
06/08/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House