LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB225
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB225
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB225
Action History
02/28/2024
Signed by Governor
01/11/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
06/21/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits
06/15/2023
Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate
06/15/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
06/13/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 6 On Its Merits
06/12/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House