08/02/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/11/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
03/20/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 5 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |||
03/07/2024 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |||
03/07/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |||
03/07/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 263 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
02/29/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 263 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
01/17/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 5 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits | |||
12/14/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |