|
06/18/2024
|
Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
|
|
|
|
06/18/2024
|
Passed By House. Votes: 31 YES 5 NO 4 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
|
|
|
|
06/18/2024
|
Amendment HA 7 to HB 265 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
|
|
|
|
06/18/2024
|
Amendment HA 6 to HB 265 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
|
|
|
|
06/18/2024
|
Amendment HA 5 to HB 265 - Stricken in House
|
|
|
|
06/18/2024
|
Amendment HA 4 to HB 265 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
|
|
|
|
06/18/2024
|
Amendment HA 3 to HB 265 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
|
|
|
|
06/18/2024
|
Amendment HA 2 to HB 265 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
|
|
|
|
06/18/2024
|
Amendment HA 1 to HB 265 - Stricken in House
|
|
|
|
06/18/2024
|
Amendment HA 7 to HB 265 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
|
|
|
|
06/13/2024
|
Amendment HA 6 to HB 265 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
|
|
|
|
05/14/2024
|
Amendment HA 5 to HB 265 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
|
|
|
|
05/14/2024
|
Amendment HA 4 to HB 265 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
|
|
|
|
05/14/2024
|
Amendment HA 3 to HB 265 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
|
|
|
|
05/14/2024
|
Amendment HA 2 to HB 265 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
|
|
|
|
05/14/2024
|
Amendment HA 1 to HB 265 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
|
|
|
|
01/23/2024
|
Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits, 2 Unfavorable
|
|
|
|
09/01/2023
|
Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
|
|
|