LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB268
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB268
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB268
Action History
10/23/2024
Signed by Governor
06/27/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
03/20/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
01/23/2024
Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
01/23/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
01/10/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 6 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
01/04/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House