LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB270
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB270
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB270
Action History
08/15/2024
Signed by Governor
06/26/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 6 NO
05/22/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
04/18/2024
Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
04/18/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 27 YES 9 NO 5 ABSENT
04/18/2024
Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
03/21/2024
was introduced and adopted in lieu of HB 270