05/30/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
03/19/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
03/13/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 8 Favorable | |||
01/25/2024 | Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate | |||
01/25/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT | |||
01/25/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 271 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
01/24/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 271 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
01/23/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources & Energy) in House with 2 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |||
01/04/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources & Energy Committee in House |