LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB287
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB287
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB287
Action History
10/23/2024
Signed by Governor
06/26/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
05/22/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
05/07/2024
Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate
05/07/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 6 ABSENT
03/27/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 14 On Its Merits
01/17/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House