10/23/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/27/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |||
06/18/2024 | Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |||
06/18/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |||
06/18/2024 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 291 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/18/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 291 - Stricken in House | |||
05/15/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |||
04/18/2024 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 291 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
02/29/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 291 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
01/17/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |