LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB293
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB293
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB293
Action History
10/23/2024
Signed by Governor
06/26/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
05/15/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
04/18/2024
Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
04/18/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 7 ABSENT
03/28/2024
was introduced and adopted in lieu of HB 293