08/29/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING | |||
06/30/2024 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |||
06/30/2024 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |||
06/26/2024 | Laid On Table in Senate | |||
06/26/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT | |||
06/26/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 297 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/26/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 297 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
03/12/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |||
01/24/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation Committee in House |