08/16/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 6 NO | |||
06/07/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |||
05/16/2023 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |||
05/16/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 3 NO 4 ABSENT | |||
05/16/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 3 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
05/16/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 3 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/10/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 10 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |||
04/25/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |