07/29/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
05/08/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in Senate with 8 Favorable | |||
04/16/2024 | Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in Senate | |||
04/16/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |||
04/16/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 310 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
03/27/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in House with 16 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |||
03/20/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 310 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
01/25/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House |