10/09/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NO | |||
06/27/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/27/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to HS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/26/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/12/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits | |||
05/09/2024 | Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |||
05/09/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 2 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT | |||
05/09/2024 | Amendment HA 2 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
05/09/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
05/09/2024 | Amendment HA 2 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
04/24/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |||
04/16/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
03/21/2024 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 316, and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |