09/19/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/30/2024 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |||
06/30/2024 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |||
06/27/2024 | Laid On Table in Senate | |||
06/27/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |||
06/27/2024 | Amendment HA 4 to HB 329 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/27/2024 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 329 - Stricken in House | |||
06/27/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 329 - Stricken in House | |||
06/26/2024 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 329 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
05/08/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 329 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
03/19/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |||
03/07/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |