06/22/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/15/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
03/16/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |||
03/15/2023 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
03/15/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 6 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |||
03/09/2023 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |||
03/09/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
03/07/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |||
01/26/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
01/26/2023 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 33, and Assigned to Ready List in House |