09/30/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/30/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |||
06/26/2024 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
06/26/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |||
06/20/2024 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |||
06/20/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |||
06/20/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 330 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/20/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |||
06/13/2024 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
06/12/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |||
05/16/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 330 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
03/07/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |