07/17/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
05/21/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 5 NO | |||
05/15/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits | |||
03/19/2024 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |||
03/19/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 29 YES 10 NO 2 ABSENT | |||
03/19/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 334 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
03/19/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 334 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
03/12/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |||
03/07/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |