10/25/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/27/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |||
06/26/2024 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |||
06/26/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |||
06/18/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |||
06/18/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |||
06/12/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |||
03/21/2024 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |||
03/20/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 7 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |||
03/14/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |