LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB349
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB349
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB349
Action History
06/30/2024
Signed by Governor
06/18/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
05/21/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
05/14/2024
Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate
05/14/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
04/16/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
03/14/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House