04/26/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
04/05/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
03/08/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |||
01/17/2023 | Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate | |||
01/17/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT | |||
01/17/2023 | Amendment HA 3 to HB 35 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
01/17/2023 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 35 - Stricken in House | |||
01/17/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 35 - Stricken in House | |||
01/17/2023 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 35 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
01/17/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 35 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
01/11/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |||
12/15/2022 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |