LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB363
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB363
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB363
Action History
10/09/2024
Signed by Governor
06/30/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 5 NO 1 NOT VOTING
06/12/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Land Use) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits
05/14/2024
Assigned to Housing & Land Use Committee in Senate
05/14/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 2 NO 3 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
04/25/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Housing) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
04/11/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Housing Committee in House