09/19/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/30/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to HS 1 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/30/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |||
06/29/2024 | Amendment SA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/13/2024 | Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate | |||
06/13/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 1 NO 3 ABSENT | |||
06/13/2024 | Amendment HA 2 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/13/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/13/2024 | Amendment HA 2 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/13/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/06/2024 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of HB 383 |