LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB385
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB385
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB385
Action History
11/01/2024
Signed by Governor
06/27/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
06/26/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
06/20/2024
Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
06/20/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
06/18/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
05/02/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House