LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB386
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB386
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB386
Action History
08/29/2024
Signed by Governor
06/26/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
06/18/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
05/23/2024
Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate
05/23/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
05/14/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 4 On Its Merits
05/07/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House