10/31/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/30/2024 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |||
06/30/2024 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |||
06/26/2024 | Laid On Table in Senate | |||
06/26/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |||
06/12/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |||
06/11/2024 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 387, and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |