LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB392
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB392
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB392
Action History
07/25/2024
Signed by Governor
06/26/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
06/18/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
06/11/2024
Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate
06/11/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
05/21/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 6 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
05/14/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House