10/23/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/18/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |||
06/11/2024 | Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate | |||
06/11/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |||
06/11/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 404 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
05/21/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Agriculture) in House with 7 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |||
05/16/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House |