09/19/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/27/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |||
06/20/2024 | Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |||
06/20/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT | |||
06/20/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 411 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/20/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 411 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/18/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 11 On Its Merits | |||
06/11/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |