09/19/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/26/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits | |||
06/20/2024 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |||
06/20/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |||
06/20/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 432 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/20/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 432 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/12/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 13 On Its Merits | |||
06/06/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |