LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB442
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB442
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB442
Action History
07/17/2024
Signed by Governor
06/30/2024
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
06/18/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Land Use) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
06/13/2024
Assigned to Housing & Land Use Committee in Senate
06/13/2024
Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
06/12/2024
Reported Out of Committee (Housing) in House with 4 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
06/06/2024
Introduced and Assigned to Housing Committee in House