01/26/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
01/26/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 16 YES 4 NO 1 ABSENT | |||
01/26/2023 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |||
01/26/2023 | Laid On Table in Senate | |||
01/25/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 5 Favorable | |||
01/18/2023 | Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate | |||
01/18/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |||
01/17/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 6 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |||
01/13/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House |