04/26/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
04/04/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NOT VOTING | |||
03/29/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Land Use) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |||
03/09/2023 | Assigned to Housing & Land Use Committee in Senate | |||
03/09/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
03/09/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 61 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
03/08/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing) in House with 5 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |||
03/08/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 61 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
03/02/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Housing Committee in House |