06/30/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/29/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO | |||
06/29/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 65 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 6 YES 15 NO | |||
06/29/2023 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 65 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/28/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |||
06/28/2023 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |||
06/27/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 26 YES 9 NO 5 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |||
06/27/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 65 - Defeated In House by Voice Vote | |||
01/26/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 65 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
01/25/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 7 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |||
01/20/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |