06/27/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/15/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
05/03/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 6 Favorable | |||
03/14/2023 | Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate | |||
03/14/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |||
03/14/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 68 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
03/09/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 68 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
03/08/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 8 Favorable | |||
03/02/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |