LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB69
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB69
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB69
Action History
05/25/2023
Signed by Governor
05/11/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
04/26/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
03/16/2023
Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate
03/16/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
03/07/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 4 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
03/02/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House