04/12/2023 | Signed by Governor | |||
04/04/2023 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
03/29/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits | |||
03/09/2023 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |||
03/09/2023 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |||
03/09/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 71 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
03/08/2023 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 71 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
03/08/2023 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |||
03/02/2023 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |