LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB72
Action History
DE
Delaware House Bill HB72
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HB72
Action History
07/21/2023
Signed by Governor
06/22/2023
Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
05/10/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
03/16/2023
Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
03/16/2023
Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
03/08/2023
Reported Out of Committee (Housing) in House with 6 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
03/02/2023
Introduced and Assigned to Housing Committee in House