|
09/11/2023
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2023
|
Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
|
|
|
|
06/27/2023
|
Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
|
|
|
|
06/27/2023
|
Amendment SA 2 to HB 78 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
|
|
|
|
06/27/2023
|
Amendment SA 1 to HB 78 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
|
|
|
|
06/26/2023
|
Amendment SA 2 to HB 78 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
|
|
|
|
06/13/2023
|
Amendment SA 1 to HB 78 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
|
|
|
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee (Environment, Energy & Transportation) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
|
|
|
|
04/06/2023
|
Assigned to Environment, Energy & Transportation Committee in Senate
|
|
|
|
04/06/2023
|
Passed By House. Votes: 36 YES 5 ABSENT
|
|
|
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment HA 2 to HB 78 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
|
|
|
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment HA 1 to HB 78 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
|
|
|
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment HA 2 to HB 78 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
|
|
|
|
03/30/2023
|
Amendment HA 1 to HB 78 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
|
|
|
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 6 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
|
|
|
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
|
|
|